Case Information: 36703 | |||
Short Caption: | TIPPIN VS. ALL STAR GAS INC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 34502 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9801342 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 09/11/2000 / Levitt, Lansford | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/05/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from James Shields Beasley-check no. 2226. | ||
09/05/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. | 00-15638 | |
09/11/2000 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
12/15/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 9, 2001. | 00-21964 | |
01/11/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 01-00631 | |
01/24/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. | 01-01532 | |
02/26/2001 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 01-03577 | |
03/14/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties to bear their own costs. SNP/CLK | 01-04545 | |
03/14/2001 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |