judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00492-CR
14-89-00492-CR
06/02/1989
All Misdemeanors
Fogo, Donald Peter
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/15/1992Opinion issuedREVERSED
05/23/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDGRANTED
03/27/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
03/19/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
03/02/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
02/15/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
02/15/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
02/15/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/16/1990Submitted
01/16/1990Submission
01/16/1990Submitted
12/19/1989Submission
11/27/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/27/1989Case ready to be set
11/27/1989Case ready to be set
11/16/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/10/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/20/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/20/1989Record Filed (Both records FILED)
07/24/1989Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
06/12/1989Motion for new trial FILED
06/02/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/23/1989Date of Sentence
05/23/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/15/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasWinston E. Cochran, Jr.
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantBrian Joseph Fischer
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 3
Harris
Honorable ROBERT A. MOEN
890,3942