judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals

Case: 12-89-00139-CR
12-89-00139-CR
06/02/1989
Other Felony
Perez, Joshua
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/18/1989
08/16/1989Mandate Issued
07/31/1989
07/17/1989
06/30/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
06/30/1989No Description Available.Dismissed
06/30/1989Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/30/1989Case ready to be set
06/30/1989Submission
06/30/1989Submitted
06/28/1989No Description Available.
06/23/1989Motion to Dismiss Appeal Filed
06/12/1989
06/08/1989Motion or Writ Denied
06/08/1989Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
06/08/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
06/02/1989
06/02/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/10/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
03/10/1989Motion For New Trial filed in trial court
02/09/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/18/1989Case StoredCase stored
08/18/2014RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
349th District Court
Honorable Melvin D. Whitaker
12,791