Case Information: 33299 | |||
Short Caption: | MINOR VS. HERNANDEZ | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A382374 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 11/19/1998 / Beatty, Thomas | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/30/1999 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/09/1998 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lyles & Associates--check no. 25090. | ||
11/09/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | ||
11/19/1998 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas D. Beatty . (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
11/24/1998 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | ||
01/25/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | ||
02/12/1999 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request and 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | ||
03/01/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/28/98. To Court Reporter: Patsy Smith. | ||
03/29/1999 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 9/28/98. Court Reporter: Patsy K. Smith. | ||
06/14/1999 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: 6/11/99. | ||
06/14/1999 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | ||
07/13/1999 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 7/12/99. | ||
08/06/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: September 10, 1999. | ||
08/09/1999 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: 9/10/99. | ||
08/20/1999 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: 8/17/99. | ||
12/30/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Submitted date: December 30, 1999. | 99-13417 | |
12/30/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/18/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Remand. " . . . we reverse the district court's order and remand this matter to the district court for further proceedings consistent with this order." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-14543 | |
09/13/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-14751 | |
09/13/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/25/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2000. | 00-14751 |