Case: 10-89-00112-CV
10-89-00112-CV
06/06/1989
Miscellaneous civil
John Arthur Rodda
Jill C. Persichetti, et vir
No
14th Court of Appeals
06/06/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/07/2002 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
06/10/1991 | Case stored | | |
06/10/1991 | Mandate issued by this Court | | |
04/25/1991 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/18/1991 | Submitted | | |
04/18/1991 | Submission | | |
02/22/1991 | Submission | | |
02/13/1990 | No Description Available. | | |
02/01/1990 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/01/1990 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/16/1990 | No Description Available. | | |
01/16/1990 | No Description Available. | | |
12/28/1989 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/21/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
12/21/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
11/22/1989 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/07/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
09/21/1989 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/07/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
08/24/1989 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/24/1989 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/07/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
08/07/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
07/10/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
06/06/1989 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |
04/20/1989 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/07/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
04/03/1989 | No Description Available. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/07/2002 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Rodda, John Arthur | Appellant | Ronald J. Desimone J.r. Seeman |
Persichetti, Donald L. | Appellee | Norma Levine Trusch |
Persichetti, Jill C. | Appellee | Norma Levine Trusch |
Trial Court Information
247th District Court
Harris
Honorable Charles Dean Huckabee
87-36571