Case: PD-0515-00
PD-0515-00
03/07/2000
PDR Case Type
GHOLSON, CHARLES THOMAS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/30/2000 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
06/07/2000 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
06/07/2000 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
04/14/2000 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
03/07/2000 | PDR FILED | | |
03/07/2000 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/03/2000 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
GHOLSON, CHARLES THOMAS | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Tony Aninao |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John B. Holmes |
Court of Appeals Information:
14-97-00192-CR
AFF 8-19-99
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
262nd District Court
Harris
Honorable DOUG SHAVER
740662