Case: 96-1232
96-1232
12/10/1996
App Writ of Error
EOLINE SMITH ARNOLD and AMERICAN FIRE & INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
AMERICAN STATES INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
12/27/1996 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
12/10/1996 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | on behalf of Eoline Smith Arnold and American Fire & Indemnity Ins. Co. | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
05/23/1997 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | case stored | | |
04/03/1997 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | Application for writ of error is denied, with the notation, "Writ Denied". | |
01/15/1997 | Notice of rehearing, etc. | change of firm name for E. Thomas Bishop | | |
01/02/1997 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
12/27/1996 | Reply to Response | | | |
12/10/1996 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | on behalf of Eoline Smith Arnold and American Fire & Indemnity Ins. Co. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
05/23/1997 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 1G1 record returned |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
ARNOLD, EOLINE SMITH | Petitioner | Mr. Fred A. Simpson |
AMERICAN STATES INSURANCE COMP | Respondent | Mr. E. Thomas Bishop Mr. Alexander N. Beard Mr. Mark Dean Johnson |
AMERICAN STATES INSURANCE COMP | Petitioner | Mr. E. Thomas Bishop |
AMERICAN INDEMNITY GROUP | Petitioner | Ms. Mary Lou Flynn-DuPart |
AMERICAN FIRE & INDEMNITY INSU | Petitioner | Ms. Mary Lou Flynn-DuPart |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-95-00706-CV
Reversed & Rendered
930 SW2d 196, 08-09-96
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable Deborah G. Hankinson
Trial Court Information
134th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Anne Ashby
93-12532-G