judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-89-00128-CV
10-89-00128-CV
06/06/1989
Unknown Civil Case Type.
John Frederick Manning
Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.
No
14th Court of Appeals
06/06/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/07/2002Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
08/29/1991Case stored
08/29/1991Mandate issued by this Court
07/11/1991Motion for Rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/28/1991Response to motion
06/24/1991No Description Available.
06/13/1991Motion for extension of time to file rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/06/1991Motion for extension of time to file rehearing
05/16/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/18/1991Submitted
04/18/1991Submission
02/22/1991Submission
07/13/1989Case ready to be set
07/13/1989No Description Available.
06/22/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
06/20/1989No Description Available.
06/12/1989No Description Available.
06/06/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
05/11/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
05/11/1989No Description Available.
05/01/1989No Description Available.
04/11/1989No Description Available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/07/2002Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Manning, John FrederickAppellantH. Victor Thomas
Merrill, Lynch Pierce, FennerAppelleeKathy D. Patrick
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 4
Harris
Honorable Charles Coussons
520,993