judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VARGAS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, a defunct Wyoming limited partnership; and KIT MARTIN, individually v. FOUR "H" RANCHES ARCHITECTURAL CONTROL COMMITTEE

Case Heading (S-07-0022)
Case Number:S-07-0022Case Docketed On:01/29/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Property
Short Title:VARGAS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, a defunct Wyoming limited partnership; and KIT MARTIN, individually v. FOUR "H" RANCHES ARCHITECTURAL CONTROL COMMITTEE
Full Title:VARGAS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, a defunct Wyoming limited partnership; and KIT MARTIN, individually, Appellants (Defendants), v. FOUR "H" RANCHES ARCHITECTURAL CONTROL COMMITTEE, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantVargas Limited PartnershipMichael H. Reese
Ronald L. Brown
AppellantKit MartinMichael H. Reese
Ronald L. Brown
AppelleeFourt "H" Ranches Arthitectural Control CommitteeJohn B. Rogers

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property -Servitudes
Opinion Number:2009 WY 26
Citation:202 P.3d 1049

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/29/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/29/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/29/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/01/2007Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance of Michael Henry Reese and Ronald L. Brown to appear on behalf of appellantsNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
02/02/2007Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
02/05/2007Order - Grant - withdrawal of counsel James R. Salisbury for appellantsOrderGrantFinal
03/12/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/13/2007Order - Grant - extension of time brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/02/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/21/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
05/30/2007Motion - Extension of time - reply brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/01/2007Order - Deny - extension to file reply briefOrderDenyFinal
06/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/18/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (appellants). Entire record designated.Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/18/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, five volumes. Volumes I-III, original papers; Volume IV, transcripts; Volume V, exhibits. (Record not filed at this time, to be returned to clerk of district court per Order Sanctioning Counsel)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/19/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/19/2007Order - Sanction - designation of record. Counsel for the appellant, Ronald L. Brown, Michael H. Reese and counsel for the appellee, John B. Rogers.OrderSanction - designation of recordFinal
06/21/2007Fees - Sanctions received - designation from counsel for appelleeFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
06/22/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Returned record signed for 6/21/07 by Julie Taylor.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
06/22/2007Notice-Incoming - Errata to brief of appelleeNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
06/27/2007Fees - Sanctions received - designation from counsel for appellants.FeesSanctions received - designationFinal
06/27/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (amended); and received copy of brief of appellant on cd.Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/29/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volumes I & II, original papers; Volume III, transcripts; Volume IV, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
07/06/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, John B. Rogers.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/27/2007Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
08/02/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Michael Reese or Ron Brown for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/15/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Ronald L. Brown and Michael H. Reese, argument by Mr. Reese for appellant; John B. Rogers for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/15/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/25/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/13/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/13/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/17/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/16/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal