judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALLEYNE, STEVE UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CM-0625
Short Caption:ALLEYNE, STEVE UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Lead:80-CM-0625Consolidated: 80-CM-0692
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M3708-80Filed Date:06/02/1980

Opening Event Date:06/02/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/17/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/26/1982
Argued/Submitted:09/08/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Melvin A. Marshall YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ALLEYNE, STEVE UNITED STATES
06/02/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/17/1980FiledRecord Completed
05/26/1982FiledBriefing Completed
09/08/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/17/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition