Case Heading (S-15-0166) | |||||
Case Number: | S-15-0166 | Case Docketed On: | 07/13/2015 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Ninth Judicial District Teton County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Sentencing 6-10-101 - 6-10-301 | ||
Short Title: | PEDRO ORLANDO ALVALLE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | PEDRO ORLANDO ALVALLE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Pedro Orlando Alvalle | Pro Se |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Peter K. Michael David L. Delicath Christyne Marie Martens |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law |
Opinion Number: | 2015 WY 151 |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
07/13/2015 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
07/13/2015 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
07/13/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
08/26/2015 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
08/27/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
08/28/2015 | Order Granting Appellant's Request for Extension to File Brief | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
09/30/2015 | Brief - Anders | Brief | Anders | Final | |
09/30/2015 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
09/30/2015 | Motion - Withdrawal of counsel | Motion | Withdrawal of counsel | Final | |
09/30/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Pro Se Brief; Brief of Appellant Pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967); and Motion with Withdraw as Counsel. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
09/30/2015 | Record - Received unfiled record from Public Defender's Office, one volume. | Record | Received unfiled record | Final | |
09/30/2015 | Order - Grant - Extension of Time to File Pro Se Brief | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
11/18/2015 | Failure to File - Brief of appellant (pro se) | Failure to File | Brief of appellant | Final | |
12/02/2015 | Opinion - Published Order Affirming the District Court's "Notice Regarding Request for Credit for Good Time" | Opinion | Published order | Final | |
12/18/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
12/18/2015 | Record - Received unfiled record to District Court Clerk | Record | Received unfiled record | Final | |
12/18/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
12/18/2015 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
12/31/2015 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - record received 12/28/15 | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |