judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WEBB, HOWARD D. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 83-CF-0824
Short Caption:WEBB, HOWARD D. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F800-82Filed Date:07/14/1983

Opening Event Date:07/14/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/28/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/24/1984
Argued/Submitted:01/31/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppellantJohn Doe N
Daniel M. Schember YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John M. Facciola YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WEBB, HOWARD D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1906 VACATED RICHARD S. STERN
07/14/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/28/1984FiledRecord Completed
10/24/1984FiledBriefing Completed
01/31/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/04/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition