judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-89-00034-CR
06-89-00034-CR
06/06/1989
Robbery
Roquemore, Joseph
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/11/1990Mandate issued
10/17/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/10/1989Submitted
10/10/1989Submission
09/18/1989Brief Filed
08/30/1989Brief Filed
07/31/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/25/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/14/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/27/1989Transcript Filed
06/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/05/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/11/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
5th District Court
Cass
Honorable Jack Ellison Carter
89-F-044
35 years TDC