Case: 05-99-02037-CR
05-99-02037-CR
12/08/1999
Theft
Siegal, Bruce
The State of Texas
No
10th Court of Appeals
01/21/2000
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/21/2000 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/21/2000 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/11/2000 | Brief Due | | |
01/11/2000 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
01/10/2000 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
01/07/2000 | Court Reporter Record Due | | |
12/17/1999 | Extension on Reporter's Record Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/16/1999 | Extension on Reporter's Record | | |
12/13/1999 | Notice to clerk that record is late | | |
12/13/1999 | Notice to reporter that record is late | | |
12/08/1999 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
12/08/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
12/03/1999 | Record due | | |
11/10/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
10/12/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
09/03/1999 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
08/05/1999 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/21/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Laura Ballard | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Laura Ballard |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | John Roach, Sr. |
Bruce Siegal | Criminal - Appellant | Paul A. Lockman |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 3
Collin
Honorable John O'keefe Barry
003-81450-97
1 YR/$4000 fINE