judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-89-00118-CR
10-89-00118-CR
06/06/1989
Burglary
James Ray Coleman
The State of Texas
No
14th Court of Appeals
06/06/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/11/2009Letter issued by the court
07/30/2009Letter received
07/20/2009Letter received
11/14/1991Case stored
11/14/1991Mandate issued by this Court
10/25/1991Case returned from higher court
09/25/1991Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
06/05/1991Case forwarded to higher court
06/03/1991Petition for discretionary review filed
04/30/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/18/1991Submitted
04/18/1991Submission
02/22/1991Submission
02/23/1990No Description Available.
02/01/1990No Description Available.
01/25/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
01/22/1990No Description Available.
12/28/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/28/1989No Description Available.
11/30/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/27/1989No Description Available.
10/30/1989No Description Available.
08/10/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/04/1989No Description Available.
06/22/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
06/06/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
05/30/1989No Description Available.
05/30/1989No Description Available.
03/28/1989No Description Available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/14/2091Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Coleman, James RayAppellantCharles H. Portz
James Ray Coleman
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
Alan Curry
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
520,072
35 Years