judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CORDERO, ROWLAND UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CM-0594
Short Caption:CORDERO, ROWLAND UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M4298-79Filed Date:07/08/1980

Opening Event Date:07/08/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/13/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/14/1981
Argued/Submitted:12/02/1981
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Russell F. Canan NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CORDERO, ROWLAND UNITED STATES
07/08/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/13/1981FiledRecord Completed
08/14/1981FiledBriefing Completed
12/02/1981FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/31/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition