judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HAMILTON, M. MARTIN, D.L.

Case Information: 81-FM-1426
Short Caption:HAMILTON, M. MARTIN, D.L.Classification:Appeals - Family - Other Family
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:A33-80Filed Date:11/23/1981

Opening Event Date:11/23/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/18/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/14/1983
Argued/Submitted:05/19/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HAMILTON, M. MARTIN, D.L. IN RE PETITION OF
11/23/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/18/1982FiledRecord Completed
03/14/1983FiledBriefing Completed
05/19/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/27/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition