judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00551-CR
01-89-00551-CR
06/06/1989
Misdemeanor
Mills, Bessie V.
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/01/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/01/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/20/1991Stay issuance of mandateMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
05/31/1991Stay issuance of mandate
05/13/1991Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
04/17/1991Writ disposedRefused
03/05/1991Case file received by higher Court or agency.
03/01/1991Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
02/06/1991Date final opinion release for publication
02/04/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
01/18/1991Motion for rehearing was not filed
01/03/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/03/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/30/1990Submitted
10/30/1990Submission
10/30/1990Submitted
09/12/1990Submission
04/16/1990Exhibits filed
04/05/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
04/05/1990Case ready to be set
04/05/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
04/05/1990Case ready to be set
03/26/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/15/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/05/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/22/1990Motion to file original exhibits disposedGrant motion
02/09/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
02/09/1990Motion to file original exhibits filed
12/21/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/12/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/26/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/10/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/10/1989Statement of facts filed
08/03/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
07/21/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
07/21/1989Transcript filed
06/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/23/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
05/23/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/01/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantJim Heaney
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 13
Harris
8910228(5 ct
0 days 0 fine (cts 1-5)