judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00126-CV
02-89-00126-CV
06/06/1989
Tax
Eastern Airlines, Inc.
Grapevine-Colleyville I.S.D., & City of Grapevine
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/31/1992Mandate Issued
10/19/1992Order Entered
09/25/1991Opinion issuedAbated
06/10/1991Response Filed
05/22/1991Letter
01/17/1990Letter
07/21/1989Case ready to be set
07/21/1989Letter
06/30/1989Other Document Filed
06/21/1989No Description Available.
06/21/1989No Description Available.
06/06/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/31/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Grapevine-colleyville I.s.d.Appellee
City Of GrapevineAppellee
Eastern Airline, Inc.Appellant
State Of Texas, Co. Of TarrantAppellee
Trial Court Information
236th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable R. Brent Keis
-L-5129-87