judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-89-00142-CR
09-89-00142-CR
06/07/1989
Robbery
Darkins, Adrienne J.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/27/1989Mandate Issued
10/11/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/02/1989Miscellaneous MotionsMotion or Writ Denied
08/22/1989Brief Filed
08/22/1989Case ready to be set
08/11/1989Brief Filed
07/12/1989Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
06/26/1989Statement of Facts Received
06/07/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/27/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Donald Floyd
51933
10 years - TDC