Case: 01-98-01193-CR
01-98-01193-CR
11/02/1998
Theft
Hughes, Kerry Franklin
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/18/2001 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
10/18/2001 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
07/21/2001 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
07/06/2001 | Motion for Rehearing Due | | |
06/21/2001 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/21/2001 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/15/2001 | Submitted | | |
05/15/2001 | Submission | | |
05/15/2001 | Submitted | | |
04/05/2001 | Oral argument has been waived | | |
02/02/2001 | Brief Due | | |
01/31/2001 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |
01/31/2001 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/31/2001 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/24/2001 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
01/12/2001 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
12/07/2000 | Brief Due | | |
11/07/2000 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |
10/27/2000 | Brief Due | | |
10/05/2000 | Order entered | Reinstate case after abatement | |
09/27/2000 | Reporter's record filed (statement of facts) | | |
09/18/2000 | Supplemental Clerks Record Filed | | |
09/14/2000 | Case reinstated | | |
09/14/2000 | Record of Abatement Hearing filed | | |
09/14/2000 | Case reinstated | | |
09/04/2000 | Abatement Hearing Record Due | | |
07/06/2000 | Order entered | Abate case | |
07/06/2000 | Order entered | Abate case | |
07/05/2000 | Submitted | | |
07/05/2000 | Submission | | |
07/05/2000 | Submitted | | |
06/15/2000 | Brief Due | | |
06/01/2000 | Extension Granted - No Further Extensions Of Time Will be Entertained | Grant motion | |
06/01/2000 | Order entered | Grant motion | |
05/23/2000 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
05/08/2000 | Brief Due | | |
04/08/2000 | Brief Due | | |
03/31/2000 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
03/27/2000 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
03/09/2000 | Order entered | Otherwise disposed | |
09/04/1999 | Response due to a motion or Court's Order. | | |
08/20/1999 | Notice to parties-non payment of rptr record | | |
07/22/1999 | Reporters record not filed - record due 30 days | | |
01/05/1999 | Reporter's Record Past Due Notice sent | | |
11/24/1998 | Record due | | |
11/23/1998 | Clerk's record filed (transcript) | | |
11/02/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
10/26/1998 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
09/25/1998 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/18/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
JUDGE, TRIAL | Trial court judge | |
District Clerk, District | District clerk | |
REPORTER, COURT | Court reporter | |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Julie Klibert John B. Holmes |
HUGHES, KERRY FRANKLIN | Criminal - Appellant | Donald R. Davis Mary Casey Newton |
COORDINATOR, TRIAL COURT | Trial court coordinator |
Trial Court Information
338th District Court
Harris
Honorable MARY E. BACON
780516