Case: 08-96-00463-CR
08-96-00463-CR
12/12/1996
Other Felony
Smith, Jamal Kenyatte
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/18/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/18/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/31/1999 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/31/1999 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/24/1998 | Submitted | | |
03/24/1998 | Submission | | |
03/24/1998 | Submitted | | |
02/04/1998 | Filed waiver of oral argument | | |
01/28/1998 | Submission | | |
11/19/1997 | Brief Filed | | |
11/19/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/19/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/05/1997 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/05/1997 | Order entered | | |
10/21/1997 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
09/23/1997 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/23/1997 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
08/05/1997 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/05/1997 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
08/05/1997 | Supplemental Transcript Filed | | |
07/30/1997 | Miscellaneous filing | | |
07/23/1997 | Motion to supplement disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/11/1997 | Brief Filed | | |
07/11/1997 | Motion to supplement filed | | |
06/11/1997 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/27/1997 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
04/30/1997 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/30/1997 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
03/14/1997 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/14/1997 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
02/21/1997 | Motion to supplement disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/21/1997 | Sup. St. of Facts Filed | | |
02/03/1997 | Motion to supplement filed | | |
01/31/1997 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
01/22/1997 | Motion for Extension Statement of Facts Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/09/1997 | Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed | | |
12/23/1996 | Transcript Filed | | |
12/12/1996 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
12/12/1996 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/18/1999 | Case Stored | Court has determined no historical value - file to be destroyed once retention schedule has been met |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
SMITH, JAMAL K. | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. M. Clara Hernandez |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Jaime E. Esparza |
Trial Court Information
243rd District Court
El Paso
Honorable David Guaderrama
960D08933
50 Yrs. IDTDCJ