judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-721
A-721
11/01/1945
Application for Writ of Error
R. G. DUDDING, ET UX.
AUTOMATIC GAS COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/27/1946Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/19/1946Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
01/04/1946Brief on the MeritsRespondent
11/08/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
11/01/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/27/1946Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/19/1946Brief in Support of Petition
01/04/1946Brief on the Merits
11/26/1945Letter Filed
11/21/1945Document received (See Remarks)
11/08/1945Response to Petition
11/01/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/01/1945Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
R. G. Dudding, et ux.Petitioner
Automatic Gas CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information