Case Information: 38789 | |||
Short Caption: | REALTY TRUST OF NEVADA VS. WAZIR ENTERPRISES | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 38754 , 38921 , 39012 , 39050 , 39209 , 39425 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A438273 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/15/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
11/15/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 01-19066 | |
11/15/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | ||
11/29/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Sue Ann Flammang-check no. 1101. | ||
12/17/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn3[We have considered the proper person documents received from appellant, and we deny the relief requested as moot in light of this order.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 01-21169 | |
01/14/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-00527 | |
01/14/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/29/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Denying Proper Person Motions as Moot. This proper person appeal from a minute order was dismissed for lack of jurisdiction of December 17, 2001. Since that order was entered, appellant has submitted several documents to this court. In light of the December 17, 2001 order dismissing the appeal, we deny the relief requested as moot. fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have considered the proper person documents received from him.] | 02-01887 | |
02/01/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 17, 2002. | 02-00527 |