Case: 02-99-00056-CR
02-99-00056-CR
02/17/1999
All Misdemeanors
Waggoner, Jr., Curtis Pearson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/23/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/20/2001 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
07/16/2001 | Order Entered | | |
06/13/2001 | Petition for Review Disposed in Higher Court | Refused | |
03/30/2001 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
02/26/2001 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA | | |
02/26/2001 | Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/23/2001 | Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/21/2000 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
12/04/2000 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
11/16/2000 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/14/2000 | Submitted | | |
05/15/2000 | Submission | | |
05/15/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/15/2000 | Brief Filed | | |
04/18/2000 | Brief Filed | | |
04/18/2000 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/17/2000 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
04/14/2000 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/10/2000 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
03/16/2000 | Order Entered | | |
03/15/2000 | Supplemental Reporter's Record Filed | | |
02/25/2000 | Order Entered | Abated | |
02/01/2000 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/21/2000 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
12/21/1999 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/20/1999 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
10/04/1999 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/04/1999 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
08/23/1999 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
08/10/1999 | Letter | | |
08/06/1999 | Other Document Received | | |
07/06/1999 | Request for Extension of Reporter's Record | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/30/1999 | Received Reporter's Record Affidavit or Letter | | |
06/18/1999 | Other Document Received | | |
05/21/1999 | Letter | | |
05/20/1999 | Other Document Received | | |
05/19/1999 | Reporter's Record Not Received | | |
05/19/1999 | Other Document Received | | |
04/23/1999 | Motion to Withdraw as Attorney | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/21/1999 | Motion to Withdraw as Attorney | | |
04/21/1999 | Other Document Received | | |
04/07/1999 | Letter | | |
04/01/1999 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
04/01/1999 | Other Document Received | | |
02/17/1999 | Appellant's Notice of Appeal | | |
02/17/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/23/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Charles M. Mallin |
Waggoner, Jr., Curtis Pearson | Criminal - Appellant | David Chapman |
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Matthew W. Paul |
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 9
Tarrant
Honorable Brent A. Carr
0679339
24 months community supvsn