judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-1053
A-1053
10/28/1946
Certified Question from the U. S. Court of Appeals
TEXAS AND PACIFIC RAILWAY COMPANY
MRS. O. M. WOOD, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/26/1947Motion for Rehearing
01/13/1947Supplemental Brief filed
01/10/1947Supplemental Brief filed
01/08/1947Brief on the Merits
01/08/1947Brief on the Merits
10/28/1946Certified Question filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/12/1947Letter Filed
02/26/1947Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/12/1947Opinion issued
01/13/1947Supplemental Brief filed
01/10/1947Supplemental Brief filed
01/08/1947Brief on the Merits
01/08/1947Brief on the Merits
01/06/1947Stipulation Filed (see Remarks)
11/26/1946Miscellaneous Motion
11/26/1946Addendum to brief filed
10/28/1946Certified Question filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mrs. O. M. Wood, et al.Appellee
Texas and Pacific Railway CompanyAppellant
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information