judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT A. WHITE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CF-0999
Short Caption:ROBERT A. WHITE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Lead:82-CF-0999Consolidated: 84-CF-0117
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:07/20/1982

Opening Event Date:07/20/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/07/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/06/1984
Argued/Submitted:10/16/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert A. White N
Scott R. Goldman YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Kenneth J. Melilli YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WHITE, ROBERT A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1906 GOLDMANRS REPLACING OLSHONSKY
07/20/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/07/1984FiledRecord Completed
07/06/1984FiledBriefing Completed
10/16/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/26/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition