judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANDERSON, CARL A. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CF-0979
Short Caption:ANDERSON, CARL A. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Lead: 82-CF-0950 Consolidated:82-CF-0979, 82-CF-0980
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4455-80Filed Date:07/16/1982

Opening Event Date:07/16/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/16/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/01/1983
Argued/Submitted:11/02/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Mary A. Incontro YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ANDERSON, CARL A. UNITED STATES
07/16/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/16/1982FiledRecord Completed
08/01/1983FiledBriefing Completed
11/02/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/09/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition