Case: 07-83-00253-CR
07-83-00253-CR
09/23/1983
Other Felony
Henderson, Thomas Doyle
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/23/1984 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/21/1984 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
08/17/1984 | Submitted | | |
03/02/1984 | Brief Filed | | |
02/07/1984 | Brief Filed | | |
01/25/1984 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disp. | GRANT | |
01/24/1984 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
12/28/1983 | Do not use | | |
09/23/1983 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/23/1984 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
237th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable John R. McFall
400595
5 years