judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DURANT, CLARENCE DELWIN REALTY COMPANY

Case Information: 80-CV-0278
Short Caption:DURANT, CLARENCE DELWIN REALTY COMPANYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA77901-79Filed Date:03/11/1980

Opening Event Date:03/11/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/29/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/26/1981
Argued/Submitted:03/17/1981
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Richard A. Boswell NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Travis A. Murrell NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DURANT, CLARENCE DELWIN REALTY COMPANY
03/11/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/29/1980FiledRecord Completed
01/26/1981FiledBriefing Completed
03/17/1981FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/18/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition