judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RAUL GARAY, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-220)
Case Number:06-220Case Docketed On:09/25/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Washakie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:RAUL GARAY, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RAUL GARAY, JR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRaul Garay Jr.Jack R. Vreeland
Robert Michael Archuleta
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Cathleen D. Parker

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 130
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/25/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/25/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/25/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/25/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/10/2006Order - Convert to petition - Order converting untimely appeal to writ of reviewOrderConvert to petitionFinal
11/06/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/07/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/22/2006Motion - Admission pro hac vice - Robert Michael Archuleta on behalf of AppellantMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
12/22/2006Order - Pro hac vice - allow - Robert Michael ArchuletaOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
12/22/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/01/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/16/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/12/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; volume II, transcripts; volume III, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/16/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Cathleen ParkerNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/27/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Robert Michael ArchuletaNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/15/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Jack R. Vreeland and Robert Michael Archuleta, argument by Mr. Archuleta for appellant; Cathleen D. Parker, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/15/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/10/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/28/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/28/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/04/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 8/30/07 by SuZann Whitlock.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal