Case: 04-02-00167-CV
04-02-00167-CV
02/28/2002
Summary Judgment
Statewide Waste Systems, Inc.
Texas Waste Systems, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/28/2012 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
06/09/2003 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/31/2003 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed | |
12/02/2002 | Submitted | | |
10/30/2002 | Submission | Motion or Writ Denied | |
09/04/2002 | Brief Filed | | |
09/04/2002 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
09/04/2002 | Case ready to be set | | |
08/13/2002 | Order Entered | | |
08/13/2002 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/31/2002 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
07/03/2002 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disp/Per Curiam/Clerk's Order | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/02/2002 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
06/28/2002 | Information regarding cause received | | |
06/03/2002 | Brief Filed | | |
06/03/2002 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
05/03/2002 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disp/Per Curiam/Clerk's Order | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/02/2002 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
04/17/2002 | Case NOT referred to mediation. ADR file closed. | | |
04/15/2002 | ADR Addendum filed | | |
04/08/2002 | ADR To Be Reviewed By Atty | | |
04/01/2002 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
02/28/2002 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
02/28/2002 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
02/28/2002 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |
02/28/2002 | Information regarding cause received | | |
02/28/2002 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
01/28/2002 | Judgment Signed in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/28/2012 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Statewide Waste Systems, Inc. | Appellant | Andrew R. Korn David M. Diaz |
Texas Waste Systems, Inc. | Appellee | Michael J. Murray Mark A. Giltner Nissa M. Dunn |
Trial Court Information
37th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Patrick J. Boone
1998-CI-12586