Case Heading (S-14-0319) | |||||
Case Number: | S-14-0319 | Case Docketed On: | 12/30/2014 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Sixth Judicial District Campbell County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060 | ||
Short Title: | BRANDON LEE HERTEL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | BRANDON LEE HERTEL, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Petitioner | Brandon Lee Hertel | Tina N. Olson Diane M. Lozano Eric M. Alden |
Respondent | The State of Wyoming | Peter K. Michael David L. Delicath Jenny Lynn Craig |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
12/30/2014 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
12/30/2014 | Petition - Writ - certiorari - Petition for Writ of Review, or, in the Alternative, Petition for Writ of Certiorari | Petition | Writ - certiorari | Final | |
12/30/2014 | Motion - In forma pauperis, and received proposed order. (Affidavit and Order for Court Appointed Counsel not scanned as it contained unredacted information). | Motion | In forma pauperis | Final | |
01/05/2015 | Event - Phone Call from the AG's office. They will not be responding to the petition. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
01/21/2015 | Order - Petition for review - grant (converted to direct appeal) | Order | Petition for review - grant | Final | |
03/10/2015 | Event - Phone Call to District Court Clerk, transcripts have been filed and completion notice should be going out. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
03/12/2015 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
03/12/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
04/24/2015 | Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiver | Motion | Dismiss - voluntary with waiver | Final | |
04/27/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal; and received proposed Order | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/27/2015 | Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated | Order | Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated | Final | |
04/27/2015 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final |