Case: 13-99-00100-CR
13-99-00100-CR
03/01/1999
Burglary of a Habitation
Billman, Daniel Benson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/09/1999 | Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk | | |
10/29/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/05/1999 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
08/05/1999 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/21/1999 | request for documents | | |
05/25/1999 | Additional copy(s) of Motion to Dismiss | | |
05/21/1999 | request for documents | | |
05/20/1999 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
05/07/1999 | 10 day letter sent | | |
03/29/1999 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
03/08/1999 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
03/08/1999 | Court Reporter Pages | | |
03/08/1999 | Reporter's Record Received | | |
03/01/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
03/01/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/29/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Stephen B. Tyler |
Billman, Daniel Benson | Appellant | Hon. Joyce Leita |
Trial Court Information
24th District Court
Victoria
Honorable Robert C Cheshire
96-1-16,369-A
5 yrs TDCJ