Case Heading (S-15-0001) | |||||
Case Number: | S-15-0001 | Case Docketed On: | 01/05/2015 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Sixth Judicial District Campbell County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509 | ||
Short Title: | JOHN WAYNE BUTLER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | JOHN WAYNE BUTLER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | John Walter Butler | Diane M. Lozano Tina N. Olson David E. Westling |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Peter K. Michael David L. Delicath Jenny Lynn Craig Joshua Charles Eames |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law -Sentencing, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence |
Opinion Number: | 2015 WY 119 |
Citation: | 358 P.3d 1259 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
01/05/2015 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
01/05/2015 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
01/05/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
02/19/2015 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
02/23/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief; and received proposed order. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/23/2015 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
03/25/2015 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
03/26/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
05/04/2015 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
05/05/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received Appellee's Designation of Record | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
05/12/2015 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
05/26/2015 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
05/26/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
06/02/2015 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
06/02/2015 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I - Original Papers; Volume II - Transcripts; Volume III - Confidential File. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
06/02/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
08/04/2015 | Order - Other - Notice of Reassignment Following Retirement (Justice Kite) | Order | Other | Final | |
09/11/2015 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Fox writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
09/29/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
09/29/2015 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
09/29/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
09/29/2015 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
10/05/2015 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record received 10/1/2015 | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |