Case: 14-00-00708-CR
14-00-00708-CR
06/23/2000
Assault & battery
Harkins, Rick Allen
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/10/2003 | Case stored | | |||
01/10/2003 | Mandate Issued | | |||
12/30/2002 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||
12/27/2002 | Record RETURNED from Higher Court | | |||
12/13/2002 | Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSED | REFUSED | | ||
11/27/2002 | Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSED | REFUSED | | ||
09/05/2002 | Record Sent | | |||
07/29/2002 | Petition for Discretionary Review FILED | | |||
07/29/2002 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |||
07/12/2002 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |||
07/12/2002 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |||
06/27/2002 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED |
| ||
05/17/2001 | Submitted | | |||
05/17/2001 | Submission | | |||
05/17/2001 | Submitted | | |||
03/15/2001 | Sumission letter 39.7 sent this date | | |||
11/22/2000 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
11/22/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |||
11/22/2000 | State's brief DUE | | |||
11/22/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |||
10/23/2000 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |||
10/23/2000 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
10/05/2000 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | | ||
09/26/2000 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
09/25/2000 | Past due brief | | |||
09/22/2000 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |||
08/24/2000 | Clerk's Record DUE | | |||
08/24/2000 | Record due | | |||
08/23/2000 | Clerk's record FILED - APP,STA | | |||
07/11/2000 | Docketing statement DUE | | |||
06/27/2000 | Reporters record FILED - ANT,APP,STA | | |||
06/26/2000 | Clerk's copy of NOA FILED | | |||
06/23/2000 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
05/12/2000 | Motion for new trial FILED | | |||
04/26/2000 | Date of Sentence | | |||
04/26/2000 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/10/2003 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Leitner, James M. | Criminal - Appellant | James M. Leitner |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Bridgett R. Anderson |
Trial Court Information
176th District Court
Harris
Honorable JAMES BRIAN RAINS
813,238
30 yrs tdc.