Case: 05-83-01151-CV
05-83-01151-CV
09/30/1983
Injunction
Triple H Renovators Corporation
The HHH Corporation
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/24/1984 | Order Entered | Otherwise Disposed | |
09/24/1984 | Order Entered | Otherwise Disposed | |
06/22/1984 | Motion to stay disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/21/1984 | Response to Motion | | |
06/08/1984 | Proceeding stayed & suspended as of date petition filed in bankruptcy court. | | |
03/29/1984 | Brief Filed | | |
03/01/1984 | Brief Filed | | |
02/10/1984 | Letter Filed | | |
02/06/1984 | Exhibits Filed | | |
02/06/1984 | Exhibits Filed | | |
02/06/1984 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
10/27/1983 | MattConv | | |
10/24/1983 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
10/14/1983 | Mot Ext Time File Record Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/07/1983 | Response to Motion | | |
10/06/1983 | Transcript Filed | | |
09/30/1983 | Extend Time to File Record | | |
09/30/1983 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
09/01/1983 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |
06/29/1983 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/24/1984 | Case Stored | Case abated |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John M Marshall
83-761-A