judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-703
A-703
09/24/1945
Application for Writ of Error
TRIANGLE CAB COMPANY, A CORPORATION
ALLEN C. TAYLOR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/07/1946Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/08/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
09/24/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/07/1946Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/08/1945Response to Petition
10/30/1945Stipulation Filed (see Remarks)
10/17/1945Document received (See Remarks)
10/17/1945Document received (See Remarks)
09/24/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
09/24/1945Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Allen C. TaylorRespondent
Triangle Cab Company, a CorporationPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information