Case: PD-0138-99
PD-0138-99
02/03/1999
PDR Case Type
TANKERSLEY, PAYTON ELLIS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/22/1999 | RESPONSE FILED | State | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/14/1999 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
04/28/1999 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
04/28/1999 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
02/22/1999 | RESPONSE FILED | | |
02/03/1999 | PDR FILED | | |
02/03/1999 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/19/1999 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
TANKERSLEY, PAYTON ELLIS | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Roy E. Greenwood |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Bill Neal |
Court of Appeals Information:
11-97-00177-CR
AFF 11-19-98
11th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
50th District Court
Knox
Honorable DAVID HAJEK
3552