Case: 13-01-00863-CV
13-01-00863-CV
12/28/2001
Mandamus
In Re: Everstar Merchandise Co., Ltd.
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/13/2013 | Case stored | | |
01/28/2002 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
01/28/2002 | Writ Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
01/25/2002 | Writ Filed | | |
01/17/2002 | Order Issued with Disposition | Motion or Writ Denied | |
01/17/2002 | Writ Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
01/07/2002 | Reply to _______ | | |
01/02/2002 | Order Entered | | |
01/02/2002 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/02/2002 | Response to _____________. | | |
12/28/2001 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
12/28/2001 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
12/28/2001 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
12/28/2001 | Motion to Stay | | |
12/28/2001 | Writ Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/17/2002 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
De La Luz Moralez Alvarez, et al., Maria | Real Parties | Hon. Mark A. Cantu Hon. Shiree D. Salinas |
Gonzalez, Noe | Respondent | |
Broadway Hardware | Real Parties | |
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. | Real Parties | Hon. Jaime A. Drabek |
Everstar Merchandise Co., Ltd. | Relator | Hon. Joe "Jose" E. Garcia W. Wendell Hall Hon. Robert L. Guerra |
Trial Court Information
370th District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Noe Gonzalez
C-637-01-G