Case: 04-02-00028-CV
04-02-00028-CV
12/28/2001
Divorce
Michael Glyn Brown
Darlina Brown
No
01/11/2002
4th Court of Appeals
01/08/2002
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/28/2012 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
01/31/2003 | Original Exhibits Returned | | |
01/24/2003 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/20/2002 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
11/20/2002 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/20/2002 | Submitted | | |
11/20/2002 | Submission | | |
11/07/2002 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
10/01/2002 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disp/Per Curiam/Clerk's Order | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/27/2002 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
08/28/2002 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
08/28/2002 | Reporters Record Filed | | |
08/15/2002 | Order Entered | | |
08/15/2002 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | Filing is Noted by Court | |
08/05/2002 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | | |
05/23/2002 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | Filing is Noted by Court | |
05/13/2002 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | | |
05/09/2002 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | | |
03/27/2002 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | Filing is Noted by Court | |
03/11/2002 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | | |
03/07/2002 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | | |
03/07/2002 | Information regarding cause received | | |
03/04/2002 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
02/19/2002 | Case NOT referred to mediation. ADR file closed. | | |
02/14/2002 | ADR Addendum filed | | |
02/14/2002 | ADR Addendum filed | | |
01/22/2002 | Information regarding cause received | | |
01/17/2002 | Information regarding cause received | | |
01/09/2002 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |
01/09/2002 | Information regarding cause received | | |
01/09/2002 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |
01/07/2002 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
12/28/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
12/20/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
11/30/2001 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
11/01/2001 | Judgment Signed in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/28/2012 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Brown, Darlina | Appellee | Wendy S. Burgower Kenneth T. Fibich Laron D. Robinson |
Brown, Michael Glyn | Appellant | Shawn Casey Richard N. Countiss |
Trial Court Information
410th District Court
Montgomery
Honorable K. Michael Mayes
01-02-00811-CV