judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JENKINS, SAUNDRA UNITED STATES

Case Information: 83-CM-0409
Short Caption:JENKINS, SAUNDRA UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:04/05/1983

Opening Event Date:04/05/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/15/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/22/1983
Argued/Submitted:03/29/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Thomas Reed Kennedy NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JENKINS, SAUNDRA UNITED STATES
04/05/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/15/1983FiledRecord Completed
12/22/1983FiledBriefing Completed
03/29/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/29/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition