Case: 04-01-00119-CR
04-01-00119-CR
02/08/2001
Aggravated Robbery
Bobby Joe Tedder
State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/12/2001 | Mandate Executed By The Trial Court | | |
09/07/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/13/2001 | Submitted | | |
06/13/2001 | Submission | | |
06/13/2001 | Case ready to be set | | |
06/13/2001 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
06/11/2001 | Addresses List of Attorneys | | |
06/04/2001 | Reporters Record Filed | | |
06/01/2001 | Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law Filed | | |
05/24/2001 | Order Entered | | |
03/30/2001 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
03/26/2001 | Order Entered | | |
03/19/2001 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
03/14/2001 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
03/14/2001 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | | |
02/08/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
02/08/2001 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |
02/08/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
02/07/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
01/10/2001 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/07/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Susan D. Reed |
Tedder, Bobby Joe | Criminal - Appellant | Jeanne Louise Blomster |
Trial Court Information
290th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Sharon MacRae
1999-CR-4647
15 YEARS (WITH AFFIRMATIVE FINDING OF A DEADLY WPN)