Case Heading (S-14-0281) | |||||
Case Number: | S-14-0281 | Case Docketed On: | 11/21/2014 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Ninth Judicial District Sublette County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Insurance Code (Title 26) | ||
Short Title: | HOLLI LUNDAHL v. KIMBALL LUNDAHL | ||||
Full Title: | HOLLI LUNDAHL, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. KIMBALL LUNDAHL, Appellee (Defendant). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Holli Telford aka Lundahl | Pro Se |
Appellee | Kimball Lundahl | Pro Se |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
11/21/2014 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
11/21/2014 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
11/21/2014 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
11/21/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
12/29/2014 | Event - Phone Call from Ms. Lundahl (Telford). She has not received the docketing letter. Informed her of the due date, verified her address and mailed her a copy of the docketing letter. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
01/06/2015 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
01/06/2015 | Correspondence - Outgoing to Ms. Lundahl returning her Amended Notice of Appeal that should be filed in the trial court. | Correspondence | Outgoing | Final | |
01/06/2015 | Order - Denying Appellant's Request for Extension to file Brief | Order | Deny | Final | |
01/07/2015 | Event - Phone Call with Ms. Lundahl who requested the Court's fax # so she could file an emergency Motion for Reconsideration. Ms. Lundahl was directed to review Rule 1.07. (no more than 10 pgs, original w/6 copies due w/in 24 hrs.) She was also reminded that her brief is still due. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
01/07/2015 | Event - Phone Call from Ms. Lundahl she would like to file a motion based on Rule 16(b) instead of filing her brief since she is unable to reference her prior order. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
01/07/2015 | Motion - Faxed Reconsideration of Order Refusing to Extend Time to File Opening Brief, or in the Alternative, Remand the Matter Back to the Trial Court Until the District Court has Included the Consent Final Judgment into the Record on Appeal | Motion | Reconsideration | Final | |
01/08/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Reconsider Order Refusing to Extend Time to File Opening Brief, or in the Alternative, Remand the Matter Back to the Trial Court until the District Court has Included the Consent Final Judgment into the Record on Appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
01/08/2015 | Brief - Appellant - Appellant's Opening Brief | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
01/09/2015 | Correspondence - Incoming from District Court Clerk re filing Amended Notice of Appeal | Correspondence | Incoming | Final | |
02/03/2015 | Order - Dismiss - jurisdiction | Order | Dismiss - jurisdiction | Final | |
02/19/2015 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
03/03/2015 | Correspondence - Outgoing to Kimball Lundahl returning his Appellee's Response Briefs unfiled because the case was dismissed on February 3, 2015 and closed on February 19, 2015. | Correspondence | Outgoing | Final | |
03/04/2015 | Event - Phone Call from Ms. Lundahl re order dismissing appeal, just received order dismissing appeal yesterday, claims neither she nor appellee received order. Requested Clerk electronically serve her with all orders; told her that would be a decision for the Justices to make. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
03/04/2015 | Event - Phone Call from Ms. Lundahl, advised that she would be filing a petition to recall the mandate. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
05/11/2015 | Correspondence - Outgoing returning Petitioner's Joint Petition to Recall the Mandate; Vacate the Dismissal Order and Execute the Confession Judgment Attached to the Opening Brief; as all Actions of the Court Violated Petitioners 14th Amendment Rights Under the Consititution. (Sent to address on Appellant's mailing label.) | Correspondence | Outgoing | Final | |
12/07/2015 | Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court notice of filing | Notice-Incoming | U.S. Supreme Court | Final | |
03/03/2016 | Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court - Denying her in forma pauperis motion and setting deadline for payment and submitting a petition in compliance with Rule 33.1 | Notice-Incoming | U.S. Supreme Court | Final | |
05/16/2016 | Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court Appellant failed to pay docket fee or submit petition in compliance with Court Rules; case now closed | Notice-Incoming | U.S. Supreme Court | Final |