judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MEYER (BRYAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34667
Short Caption:MEYER (BRYAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39801
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR5061Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/13/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-07555
09/10/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-08555
09/10/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-08556
09/30/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: October 7, 1999. 99-09410
10/05/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-09545
01/26/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-01273
02/23/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-02821
02/23/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/09/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 28, 2000. 00-02821