judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOAN BAKER v. AYRES AND BAKER POLE AND POST, INC., et al.

Case Heading (06-260)
Case Number:06-260Case Docketed On:11/13/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:JOAN BAKER v. AYRES AND BAKER POLE AND POST, INC., et al.
Full Title:JOAN BAKER, an individual, as a representative shareholder and as personal representative of the estate of Alvin R. Baker, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. AYRES AND BAKER POLE AND POST, INC., a Wyoming corporation; LARRY W. AYRES, an individual; and KARAN L. AYRES, an individual, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJoan BakerClark D. Stith
AppelleeAyres and Baker Pole and Post, Inc., a Wyoming corporationFord T. Bussart
AppelleeLarry W. AyresFord T. Bussart
AppelleeKaran L. AyresFord T. Bussart

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Other
Opinion Number:2007 WY 185
Citation:170 P.3d 1247

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/13/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/13/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/13/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/13/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/29/2006Brief - Appellant; and received copy on cd on 01/12/07BriefAppellantFinal
02/12/2007Brief - Appellees - and received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
02/23/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/09/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, eight volumes: Volumes I-IV, original papers; Volume V, exhibits; (Volumes VI and VII not designated); Volumes VIII-IX, original papers; Volume X, transcripts, depositions and exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/16/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Clark Stith and Ford BussartNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/15/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Clark D. Stith for appellant; Ford T. Bussart for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/15/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/30/2007Event - Phone Call - received call from Mr. Kenny Baker requesting that he be notified by phone when opinion published. See case note for number.EventPhone CallFinal
11/16/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Burke writing for the court. Justice Kite files a dissenting opinion.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/04/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/04/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/07/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 12/05/07 by Laura Tueller.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal