judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

COLUMBIA PLAZA TENANTS' ANTONELLI, D. F.

Case Information: 80-CV-0189
Short Caption:COLUMBIA PLAZA TENANTS' ANTONELLI, D. F.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA11796-79Filed Date:02/04/1980

Opening Event Date:02/04/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/10/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/28/1981
Argued/Submitted:01/05/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901COLUMBIA PLAZA TENANTS' ASSOCIATION INC. ANTONELLI, D. F. ET AL
02/04/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/10/1980FiledRecord Completed
09/28/1981FiledBriefing Completed
01/05/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/02/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition