judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CARTER (SHANNON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38788
Short Caption:CARTER (SHANNON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45350 , 67468 , 67468-COA , 71657 , 71657-COA , 79541 , 80939
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR011055Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/15/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/15/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-19071
01/14/2002Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 02-00946
01/30/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 02-01993
03/29/2002Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. Mr. Giese has failed to respond to this court's order of January 30, 2002. We conclude that the imposition of a monetary sanction is appropriate. Mr. Giese shall personally pay the sum of $500.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide the clerk of this court with an affidavit or certificate verifying that payment has been made to the Supreme Court Law Library with 20 days of the date of this order and shall file and serve the fast track statement within 10 days of this order or show cause why Mr. Giese should not be sanctioned further. 02-05643
05/14/2002Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. Mr. Giese failed to respond to this court's order of January 30, 2002, and on March 29, 2002, we imposed a monetary sanction in the amount of $500.00 and to file the fast track statement on or before April 8, 2002. Mr. Giese has again failed to respond to this court's order. We conclude that the imposition of an additional monetary sanctions is appropriate. Mr. Giese shall personally pay the sum of $1,000.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide the clerk of this court with an affidavit or certificate verifying that payment has been made within 20 days of the date of this order. fn1[This amount is in addition to the previously-imposed sanction which is unpaid and overdue.] Mr. Giese shall file and serve the fast track statement within 10 days of this order or show cause why Mr. Giese should not be sanctioned further, including referral to the State Bar of Nevada for investigation and possible disciplinary action. 02-08416
05/23/2002Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 02-09139
05/23/2002AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 02-09140
05/24/2002MotionFiled Motion. Petition for Relief from Sanctions. Nos. 38786, 38787, 38788. 02-09213
05/29/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Petition for Relief from Sanctions) Nos. 38786/38787/38788. 02-09362
06/03/2002Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 02-09631
07/05/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed May 24, 2002. We have reconsidered the monetary sanctions imposed in this case in light of subsequent indications by Mr Giese that they may pose a financial hardship. We have concluded that the monetary sanctions should be vacated. We admonish Mr. Giese that we expect him to conduct this and all appeals in accordance with this court's rules, and to respond promptly and thoroughly to all orders issued by this court. 02-11444
07/29/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-12920
08/23/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-13072
08/23/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/29/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 26, 2002. 02-13072