Case: PD-1846-01
PD-1846-01
12/28/2001
PDR Case Type
DAVIS, LAQUITA
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/12/2015 | COPY REQUEST PDR |
| |||||
06/19/2015 | STATUS REQUEST PDR | Refused |
| ||||
03/22/2002 | FINAL DISP | Refused | | ||||
03/13/2002 | REHEAR RECEIVED | | |||||
03/13/2002 | REHEAR REJECTED | | |||||
03/06/2002 | PDR DISP | Refused | | ||||
03/06/2002 | PDR DISP | Refused | | ||||
01/29/2002 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |||||
12/28/2001 | PDR FILED | | |||||
12/28/2001 | PDR FILED | | |||||
11/07/2001 | EXT PDR DISP/NFE | Granted | | ||||
11/05/2001 | EXT PDR FILED | | |||||
09/17/2001 | EXT PDR DISP/NFE | Granted | | ||||
09/17/2001 | EXT PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/28/2002 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Jack Skeen, Jr. |
Davis, Laquita R. | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Laquita R. Davis |
Court of Appeals Information:
12-00-00310-CR
AFF 08-15-01
12th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
241st District Court
Smith
Honorable DIANE DEVASTO
241-0851-00