Case Information: 82-CF-0968 | |||
Short Caption: | ROBERT RAY V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F5184-81 | Filed Date: | 07/12/1982 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/12/1982 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 02/04/1983 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 06/30/1983 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 10/04/1983 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Robert Ray | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | RAY, ROBERT AKA ROBERT R. ANDERSON UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1906 | TOWNSENDN FOR PURP. OF FILING CERT. PET. | |||
07/12/1982 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
02/04/1983 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
06/30/1983 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
10/04/1983 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
10/28/1983 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |